Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Bassompierre

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1610BornChemault
7 Dec 164838.3AppointedBishop of Saintes, France
17 Jan 164938.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
1 Jul 167665.8DiedBishop of Saintes, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Bassompierre:
Bishop Louis de Bassompierre (born , died ) Bishop of Saintes

  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015