Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Malachias van Diepen, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Manokwari-Sorong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1917BornHoogwoud, Netherlands
26 May 194528.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
12 Feb 196042.8AppointedPrefect of Manokwari, Indonesia
15 Nov 196649.6AppointedBishop of Manokwari, Indonesia
4 Jun 196750.1Ordained BishopBishop of Manokwari, Indonesia
5 May 198871.0RetiredBishop of Manokwari-Sorong, Indonesia
1 Apr 200587.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Manokwari-Sorong, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Petrus Malachias van Diepen:
Bishop Petrus Malachias van Diepen O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Manokwari-Sorong

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013