Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Pacificus Bos, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}

Titular Bishop of Capitolias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1864BornUden
25 Sep 188723.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Sep 188925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Apr 190540.6AppointedPrefect of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}, Indonesia
14 Mar 191853.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}, Indonesia
18 Mar 191853.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Capitolias
17 Nov 191854.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capitolias
1933¹68.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}, Indonesia
21 Mar 193772.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}, Indonesia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Pacificus Bos:
Bishop Jan Pacificus Bos O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 110
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013