Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmundus Sybrandus Luijpen (Luypen), S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Oropus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1855Born
7 Jun 187924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 May 189842.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
21 May 189842.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
13 Nov 189843.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
2 May 192367.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Edmundus Sybrandus Luijpen (Luypen) (VIAF: 285231419)
Bishop Edmundus Sybrandus Luijpen (Luypen) S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoofdplaat, Diocese of Breda, Netherlands, Netherlands
Ordained BishopOudenbosch, Diocese of Breda, Netherlands
Death PlaceWelterden

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 428
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017