Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Valenzuela Velázquez

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1574BornCuenca
24 Mar 164267.7AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
27 Jul 164268.0Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
2 Feb 164570.6DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Valenzuela Velázquez:
Bishop Juan Valenzuela Velázquez (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,855
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 171, Number 1,067

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015