Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Queipo de Llano y Valdés

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1639SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
13 Aug 1640ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
16 Dec 1640Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
13 Jul 1643AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
17 Oct 1643DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Queipo de Llano y Valdés
Bishop Juan Queipo de Llano y Valdés (died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCangas de Tineo

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,055
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,897
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 143, and Page 198
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 168, Number 1,055
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,640, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast