Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodorus Antonius Leonardus Maria van Roosmalen, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname

Titular Bishop of Antigonea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1875Born’s Hertogenbosch
29 Sep 189621.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Oct 190126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Aug 191136.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
23 Aug 191136.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
15 Nov 191136.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
23 Jun 194367.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
9 Jun 195781.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Theodorus Antonius Leonardus Maria van Roosmalen:
Bishop Theodorus Antonius Leonardus Maria van Roosmalen C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Guyana-Suriname

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 58
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013