Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dieudonné Uringi Uuci

Bishop of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1957 Born
25 Sep 198426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Apr 200547.4AppointedBishop of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jun 200547.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Dieudonné Uringi Uuci
Bishop Dieudonné Uringi Uuci (born ) Bishop of Bunia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBunia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bunia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,902

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast