Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Seraphin Uluhogian, C.M.V. †

Deceased

Abbot Primate of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Titular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1890Born
23 May 191525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
22 Jul 196070.4AppointedAbbot Primate of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
22 Jul 196070.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
30 Oct 196070.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
16 May 196575.2DiedAbbot Primate of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

MicroData Summary for Seraphin Uluhogian
Archbishop Seraphin Uluhogian C.M.V. (born , died ) Abbot Primate of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadem, Turkey

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,964
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,960, Number 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast