Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Browne

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1786²Born
23 May 181226.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 182741.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland
20 Mar 182741.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
10 Jun 182741.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
30 Apr 182943.3SucceededBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
11 Apr 186579.2DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Browne (VIAF: 315945018)
Bishop James Browne (born 1786, died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBig Barn, Co. Wexford
Ordained BishopMaynooth
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Cavan

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 228, and Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,315
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 7, and Page 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Aug 2020

Quantcast