Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Lanigan

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1747²Born
23 Feb 177124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
10 Jul 178942.5AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
21 Sep 178942.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
11 Feb 181265.1DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Lanigan
Bishop James Lanigan (born 1747, died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrick
Ordained PriestHome of Richard Hoyne, Gerrycreen
Death PlaceHome, Jame's Street, Kilkenny
Buried Place (Original)Old, Cathedral
Buried Place (Current)St. Mary's, Cathedral

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806, Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 31
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,694
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast