Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Triveri, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1631¹BornBiella
21 Jan 169261.0AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
27 Jan 169261.0Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
24 Sep 169665.7AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
May 1697³66.3DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Triveri:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Triveri O.F.M. Conv. (born 1631, died May 1697) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 85, and Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015