Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulvio Tessaroli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segni, Italy

Titular Bishop of Medeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1879Born
24 May 190222.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 193354.0AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
2 Feb 193454.2Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
11 Nov 195272.9RetiredBishop of Segni, Italy
11 Nov 195272.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Medeli
13 Jan 195373.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fulvio Tessaroli
Bishop Fulvio Tessaroli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsola

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast