Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Tan Yanquan

Bishop of Nanning [Nanning], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Guangxi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1962 Born
29 Oct 198927.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 200340.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nanning [Nanning], China
7 Jan 200744.7AppointedBishop of Nanning [Nanning], China

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Tan Yanquan
Bishop John Baptist Tan Yanquan (born ) Bishop of Nanning [Nanning]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSacré Coeur, Cathedral, Nanning, Archdiocese of Nanning [Nanning]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Nanning [Nanning].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 21 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast