Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nanning [Nanning]

Archidioecesis Nannimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Nanning, Guanxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi)
6 August 1875ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong) Prefecture Apostolic of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi) (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuamsi
6 June 1914ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi) Vicariate Apostolic of Kuamsi
16 February 1922Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kuiceu
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuamsi
Prefecture Apostolic of Lanlung [Anlong] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nanning [Nanning]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kuamsi Vicariate Apostolic of Nanning [Nanning]
30 June 1930Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nanning [Nanning] Mission "Sui Iuris" of Wuchow [Wuzhou] (erected)
Archdiocese of Nanning [Nanning]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nanning [Nanning] Archdiocese of Nanning [Nanning]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Nanning [Nanning]
19507,5846,000,000.1%262629124ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.2, 24 Dec 2019; Data: 25 Jan 2020

Quantcast