Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vince Palunko

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

Titular Bishop of Rhodiapolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1842BornLuka Sipanjska
1 Dec 186725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
22 Jun 190462.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
22 Jun 190462.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
21 Jul 190462.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
1 Apr 192179.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vince Palunko:
Bishop Vince Palunko (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013