Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Capobianco

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornFranca
22 Mar 164932.2AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
5 Apr 164932.3Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
19 May 167356.4DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Capobianco:
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Capobianco (died ) Bishop of Siracusa

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 325
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 112, Number 684

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013