Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wilhelmus Joannes Leo Antonius van Hees, O.S.C. †

Deceased

Master General Emeritus of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1906Born
28 Aug 192822.5Solemn VowsMember of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
18 Jul 193024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
25 Jun 194640.3AppointedMaster General of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
22 Sep 198175.5ResignedMaster General of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
4 Dec 198175.7DiedMaster General Emeritus of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross

MicroData Summary for Wilhelmus Joannes Leo Antonius van Hees
Father Wilhelmus Joannes Leo Antonius van Hees O.S.C. (born , died ) Master General Emeritus of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmsterdam

  • a priest for 51.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast