Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Rodrigues de Aguiar

Deceased

Prelate of Goiás

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1768BornRio de Janeiro
18 Jun 179123.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 179123.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 181042.3AppointedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil
15 Mar 181547.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
29 Sep 181648.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
3 Oct 181850.5DiedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Rodrigues de Aguiar:
Bishop Antônio Rodrigues de Aguiar (born , died ) Prelate of Goiás

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013