Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio de São José Bastos, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1767³BornRio de Janeiro
11 Mar 178315.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Dec 179023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Jun 181446.8SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
15 Mar 181547.5ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
28 Oct 181649.2Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
19 Jul 181951.9DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antônio de São José Bastos:
Bishop Antônio de São José Bastos O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013