Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romualdo de Souza Coelho

Deceased

Bishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1762Born
19 Feb 178523.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 182058.5AppointedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
1 Apr 182159.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
15 Feb 184179.0DiedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Romualdo de Souza Coelho
Bishop Romualdo de Souza Coelho (born , died ) Bishop of Belém do Pará

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCametá

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 107
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast