Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José da Santíssima Trindade Leite, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1762BornPorto
6 Feb 178017.6ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
29 Jun 178523.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
3 Jul 178523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
12 Nov 181856.4SelectedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
27 Sep 181957.3ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
9 Apr 182057.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mariana, Brazil
28 Sep 183573.3DiedBishop of Mariana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José da Santíssima Trindade Leite
Bishop José da Santíssima Trindade Leite O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Mariana

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 252
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 May 2016