Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romualdo Antônio de Seixas Barroso

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1787BornCametá
8 Oct 180922.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 182740.3AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
28 Oct 182740.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
29 Dec 186073.9DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Romualdo Antônio de Seixas Barroso:
Archbishop Romualdo Antônio de Seixas Barroso (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013