Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Signore

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

Titular Bishop of EmmaŁs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1872BornMonteroni
10 Aug 189422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lecce, Italy
20 Jun 191846.3AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
24 Aug 191846.5Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
1 Dec 192856.8ResignedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
1 Dec 192856.8AppointedTitular Bishop of EmmaŁs
11 Aug 194472.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Signore:
Bishop Giuseppe Signore (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1918, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015