Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele delle Nocche

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1877Born
1 Jun 190124.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 192245.1AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
25 Jul 192245.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
25 Nov 196083.5DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele delle Nocche
Bishop Raffaele delle Nocche (born , died ) Bishop of Tricarico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarano

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,922, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast