Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Verrienti

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

Titular Bishop of Calynda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1871BornVeglie
19 May 189423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brindisi, Italy
23 Jun 191039.1AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
23 Jun 191039.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Calynda
11 Sep 191039.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calynda
Jun 1929³58.0ResignedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
15 Jan 193260.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Verrienti:
Bishop Adolfo Verrienti (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 65
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013