Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Cardinale

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1875Born
24 Sep 189823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
25 May 192348.2AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
15 Jul 192348.4Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
15 Aug 192348.5InstalledBishop of Verona, Italy
26 Dec 195479.8DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Cardinale
Bishop Girolamo Cardinale (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast