Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Petrelli

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1863Born
20 May 191349.9AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
24 Aug 191350.1Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
11 Sep 192360.2DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Petrelli
Bishop Angelo Petrelli (born , died ) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArnesano
Ordained BishopLecce, Diocese of Lecce

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 45
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,964

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast