Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florentino Simón y Garriga, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Prelate of São José de Alto Tocantins

Titular Bishop of Leuce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1868BornMurchante, Spain
8 Nov 189123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
10 Apr 193163.0AppointedPrelate of São José de Alto Tocantins, Brazil
10 Apr 193163.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
21 Jun 193163.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
23 Nov 193567.6DiedPrelate of São José de Alto Tocantins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Florentino Simón y Garriga:
Bishop Florentino Simón y Garriga C.M.F. (born , died ) Prelate of São José de Alto Tocantins

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015