Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Archbishop Yosyf (Józef) Semashko (Siemaszko)] †

Russian Orthodox

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Archbishop

Note/Previous Titular See: (Vilnius/ROC)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1798Born
26 Dec 182022.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Dec 182123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Apr 182930.3SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
16 Aug 182930.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
2 Apr 183334.2AppointedBishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
6 Apr 183940.2CeasedBishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
11 Apr 183940.2AppointedArchbishop
23 Nov 186869.9DiedArchbishop

MicroData Summary for Yosyf (Józef) Semashko (Siemaszko) (VIAF: 268561144)
Archbishop Yosyf (Józef) Semashko (Siemaszko) (born , died ) Archbishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStary Pawlówek, Archdiocese of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Ordained BishopSaint Catherine, Church, St. Petersburg
Death PlaceVilnius

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,901
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 287, and Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 29
  • b: CB, 17 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast