Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakiv (Jakub) Martusevyc (Martusiewicz)

Deceased

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian)


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1814SelectedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1817²ConfirmedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Sep 1818Ordained BishopBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Mar 1826³AppointedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
26 Jan 1833DiedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Jakiv (Jakub) Martusevyc (Martusiewicz)
Archbishop Jakiv (Jakub) Martusevyc (Martusiewicz) (died ) Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk)

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 266, and Page 286
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016