Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Archbishop Vasyl Luzhynskyi (Luzynskyj)] †

Russian Orthodox

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Archbishop

Note/Previous Titular See: Orsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1791²Born
6 Aug 181928.5Ordained PriestPriest of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
11 Dec 183342.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
9 Feb 183443.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
6 Apr 183948.2CeasedAuxiliary Bishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
5 Apr 184150.2AppointedArchbishop
7 Feb 187988.0DiedArchbishop

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vasyl Luzhynskyi (Luzynskyj)
Archbishop Vasyl Luzhynskyi (Luzynskyj) (born 1791, died ) Archbishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStaraja Rudnia
Death PlaceSt. Petersburg

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,784
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 6
  • b: CB, 17 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast