Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Severini, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sapë, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1806Born
26 Nov 184438.4AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
26 Jan 184538.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sapë, Albania
6 Nov 187367.4DiedBishop of Sapë, Albania

MicroData Summary for Pietro Severini
Bishop Pietro Severini O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Sapë

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarbera, Diocese of Senigallia, Italy

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 334
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast