Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Capaccio, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bar (Antivari)

Titular Bishop of Milopotamos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1815BornBracigliano
10 May 186751.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
10 May 186751.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
15 Sep 186752.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
1 Jan 187862.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Capaccio:
Bishop Gabriele Capaccio O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bar (Antivari)

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015