Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Carafa

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1540BornNaples
15 Mar 155716.7Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 155716.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
9 Apr 155716.7AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Dec 155818.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
6 Mar 155918.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
26 Apr 156019.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
16 Apr 156423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
30 Jun 156525.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
29 Aug 156525.1DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Carafa:
Cardinal Alfonso Carafa (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 1.4 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013