Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guglielmo Cardinal Sirleto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Squillace, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514²Born
12 Mar 156551.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156551.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
26 Oct 156551.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
6 Sep 156652.6AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
13 Oct 156652.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
27 Feb 156854.1AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
29 May 157359.4ResignedBishop of Squillace, Italy
1580²66.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
6 Oct 158571.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Squillace, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Sirleto (VIAF: 29566519)
Guglielmo Cardinal Sirleto (born 1514, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Squillace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuardavalle
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Lorenzo in Panisperna, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
  • a cardinal for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 234
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 10, Number 20
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast