Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Castrucci

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Chieti, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1541²Born
21 Oct 158544.8AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
3 Nov 158544.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
18 Dec 158544.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158645.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
20 Mar 159150.2ResignedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
14 Feb 159251.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
18 Aug 159554.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Castrucci
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Castrucci (born 1541, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca, Diocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBagni di Pisa, Lucca, Diocese of Lucca
Buried Place (Original)Frati Minori Osservanti, Chapel, Lucca, Diocese of Lucca

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
  • a cardinal for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1585
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 23, Number 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,585, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast