Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges d’Aradon

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1564Born
13 Feb 159025.3SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
10 Mar 159328.4ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
Jun 1593³28.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
31 May 159631.6DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges d’Aradon
Bishop Georges d’Aradon (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuinipily, Baud, Morbihan
Ordained BishopNavarre, College, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 362
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 329
  • b/c2+: LC, 13 Sep 2005
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018