Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Boccabarile

Deceased

Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1595Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 1596AppointedBishop of Ortona, Italy
28 Jan 1596Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona, Italy
12 May 1600AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
31 Oct 1623DiedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Boccabarile
Bishop Alessandro Boccabarile (died ) Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopS. Onuphre, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceOrtona, Diocese of Ortona a Mare e Campli

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 266
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 35, Number 174
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast