Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berthold Nihus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1590BornHoltorf
162231.9Converted
164857.9Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
21 Apr 165565.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Apr 165565.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
6 Jun 165565.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
10 Mar 165767.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Berthold Nihus:
Bishop Berthold Nihus (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 9.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013