Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Egon von Fürstenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1626Born
26 Dec 165933.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
10 Oct 166034.5Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 Jan 166336.7SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
30 Jul 166337.3ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
2 Sep 166337.3Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
1 Apr 168255.9DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Franz Egon von Fürstenberg (VIAF: 45040568)
Bishop Franz Egon von Fürstenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeiligenberg

  • a priest for 21.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast