Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Joseph Anton Joachim Schmid von Altenstadt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Lagania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1694Born
11 Jun 171824.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
9 Sep 171824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
20 Dec 174147.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
20 Dec 174147.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
24 Feb 174248.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania
10 Sep 175359.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Joseph Anton Joachim Schmid von Altenstadt (VIAF: 42273950)
Bishop Franz Joseph Anton Joachim Schmid von Altenstadt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBodenmais, Diocese of Regensburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Regensburg, Diocese of Regensburg
Death PlaceSteingarden

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,742, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 258, and Page 453
  • mn/bd: CB, 24 Jan 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast