Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Pontes y Cantelar, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1809Born
23 Jul 187566.3SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
17 Sep 187566.4ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
6 Feb 187666.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
18 Mar 189383.9DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Pontes y Cantelar
Bishop Vicente Pontes y Cantelar O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopMálaga, Diocese of Málaga

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 44, Number 27
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast