Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato de Santa

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1862Born
15 Apr 191451.6AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
31 May 191451.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
22 Feb 193875.5DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato de Santa
Bishop Fortunato de Santa (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForni di Sopra

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,914, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast