Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Larumbe Mallí

Deceased

Bishop of Tui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1695³BornLumbier
23 Aug 174550.2AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
1 Oct 174550.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
1 Sep 175156.2DiedBishop of Tui, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Larumbe Mallí:
Bishop José Larumbe Mallí (born , died ) Bishop of Tui

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,627
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 64, Number 302
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015