Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Ibarra y Herrera

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1726BornGuayana
17 Aug 179164.9SelectedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
19 Dec 179165.2ConfirmedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
27 May 179265.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
14 Dec 179872.2AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
27 Nov 180377.1AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
19 Sep 180680.0DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Ibarra y Herrera
Archbishop Francisco de Ibarra y Herrera (born , died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 63
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 232, and Page 437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016