Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ruzini

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1658BornVenice
2 Dec 169638.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Dec 169638.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 169839.7AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
2 Feb 169839.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
18 Mar 170849.9DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ruzini:
Bishop Luigi Ruzini (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a priest for 11.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 118
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015