Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Vinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Chiavari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1832BornSanta Margherita Ligure
6 Jun 185724.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 189360.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy
16 Jan 189360.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
12 Mar 189360.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
16 Mar 189663.3AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
26 Dec 191078.1DiedBishop of Chiavari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Vinelli:
Bishop Fortunato Vinelli (born , died ) Bishop of Chiavari

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1910
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 209, and Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013