Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo de Jesús Rojas López

Bishop of Tabasco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1957 Born
16 Sep 198326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
22 May 200447.1AppointedBishop of Nuevo Casas Grandes, Chihuahua, México
4 Aug 200447.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nuevo Casas Grandes, Chihuahua, México
7 Dec 201053.6AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
19 Jan 201153.7InstalledBishop of Tabasco, México

MicroData Summary for Gerardo de Jesús Rojas López
Bishop Gerardo de Jesús Rojas López (born ) Bishop of Tabasco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeocaltiche

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tabasco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,667
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast