Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidro Carvajal Lancaster

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1713Born
21 Jul 176047.2AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
24 Aug 176047.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
15 Jan 177157.6DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Isidro Carvajal Lancaster
Bishop Isidro Carvajal Lancaster (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cuenca, Diocese of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 77, Number 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 177
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,621
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast